This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 01:07:55 (UTC).

Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee vs. North Point Health & Wellness Centre, LP

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against North Point Health Wellness Centre, LP. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Skiles, Jon M, Negin, Stephanie and Whalen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2946

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Skiles, Jon M

Negin, Stephanie

Whalen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee

Magee, Lydell

Smith, Marcel

Defendants

North Point Health & Wellness Centre, LP

North Point Health & Wellness Center, LLC dba North Pointe Health & Wellness Center

Rockport Administrative Services, LLC

Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peck, Adam J

Defendant Attorney

Gari, Ron F

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

05/10/2023: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

03/17/2023: Minute Order Attachment

12/29/2022 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/29/2022: 12/29/2022 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/8/23 Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/08/2023: 5/8/23 Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/23 Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/05/2023: 5/5/23 Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/8/23 Proof of Service

05/08/2023: 5/8/23 Proof of Service

4/19/23 - Proof of Service

04/19/2023: 4/19/23 - Proof of Service

5/4/23 Notice of Jury Deposit

05/04/2023: 5/4/23 Notice of Jury Deposit

3/9/2023-Declaration of Ron F. Gari Regarding Meet and Confer

03/09/2023: 3/9/2023-Declaration of Ron F. Gari Regarding Meet and Confer

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Attachment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialFinancial info for North Point Health & Wellness Centre, LP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-30685 North Point Health & Wellness Centre, LP $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialFinancial info for North Point Health & Wellness Centre, LP: Transaction Assessment $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-30791 Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee: Transaction Assessment $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 04/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

FinancialFinancial info for Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-58682 Magee, Dorothy $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

FinancialFinancial info for Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

FinancialFinancial: Dorothy Magee by and through her Successor-in Interest, Lydell Matgee; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case cover sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Complaint filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less