This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 17:51:20 (UTC).

Don Roberto Jewelers Inc vs. Jenniffer Briseno

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Don Roberto Jewelers Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jenniffer Briseno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pebet, Noelle. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1410

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Roberto Jewelers Inc

Defendant

Briseno, Jenniffer Joann

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Anjelica Huerta, assistant manager

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Small Claim Court Trial

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Party Names: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc; Briseno, Jenniffer Joann; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Don Roberto Jewelers Inc; Awarded Against:; Briseno, Jenniffer Joann; Amount; Damages: $1,327.17; Costs: $75.00; Total: $1402.17

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Sonoma Amount: $1,439.46

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $12.29

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Don Roberto Jewelers Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00013149 Don Roberto Jewelers Inc $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Don Roberto Jewelers Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Sonoma Amount: $1,439.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $12.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Party Names: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc; Briseno, Jenniffer Joann; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Don Roberto Jewelers Inc; Awarded Against:; Briseno, Jenniffer Joann; Amount; Damages: $1,327.17; Costs: $75.00; Total: $1402.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Small Claim Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Anjelica Huerta, assistant manager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Don Roberto Jewelers Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00007781 Don Roberto Jewelers Inc $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Don Roberto Jewelers Inc: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc; Total Financial Assessment $125.00; Total Payments and Credits $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less