This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/23/2019 at 15:05:36 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Melissa Cowger

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Discover Bank against Melissa Cowger in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6240

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Cowger, Melissa J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Declaration Filed

Suttell_658641_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Re: Venue

Summons issued and filed

Suttell_658641_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Suttell_658641_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: POS Attached

Civil Complaint filed

Suttell_658641_com_eABC.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Suttell_658641_ccs_eABC.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Civil Document; Comment: POS Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Suttell_658641_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Suttell_658641_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Suttell_658641_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Suttell_658641_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Financial info for Cowger, Melissa J: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00009297 Cowger, Melissa J $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Financial info for Cowger, Melissa J: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Financial info for Cowger, Melissa J: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00009228 Cowger, Melissa J $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Financial info for Cowger, Melissa J: Transaction Assessment $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Financial: Cowger, Melissa J; Total Financial Assessment $370.40; Total Payments and Credits $370.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50192 Discover Bank $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Discover Bank: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less