This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 13:08:00 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Marai Elmakesbi

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marai Elmakesbi. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5102

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Elmakesbi, Marai M

Fresno, CA 93705-4515

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sebourn, Thomas J.

 

Court Documents

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: The document(s) received via mail are being returned unprocessed because the information in the attorney box is incorrect on both the Answer and Proof of Service, Attorney box info should reflect the information of the party filling the answer and proof of service. The proof of service requires an original signature.

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

Proof of Service

POS_eABC_Proof_69233924.pdf

Declaration Filed

Suttell_643255_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Re: Venue

Civil case cover sheet

Suttell_643255_ccs_eABC.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Suttell_643255_sum_eABC.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Suttell_643255_com_eABC.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: The document(s) received via mail are being returned unprocessed because the information in the attorney box is incorrect on both the Answer and Proof of Service, Attorney box info should reflect the information of the party filling the answer and proof of service. The proof of service requires an original signature.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer or Other Responsive Pleading Received- Comment: Answer - Contract with fee waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS_eABC_Proof_69233924.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Discover Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-63249 Discover Bank $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Discover Bank: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed- Suttell_643255_ven_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Suttell_643255_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Suttell_643255_sum_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Suttell_643255_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less