This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 04:41:07 (UTC).

Deyci Avila Sanchez vs. JHS Family Limited Partnership/DBH Family Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Deyci Avila Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JHS Family Limited Partnership/DBH Family Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2177

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani

Mendoza Soto, Luis Alberto

Defendant

JHS Family Limited Partnership/DBH Family Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elder, Margaret

Defendant Attorney

Wilkins, James H.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Scan).pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons (Scan).pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint for Damages - 2486 S Boyd 1.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons-JHS Family Limited.pdf

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

11-17-21 Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

11-17-21 Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement Filed

12/17/21 - Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 4-6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Estimated Time 4-6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-73213 Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service of Summons-JHS Family Limited.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-47103 Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Avila Sanchez, Deyci Estefani; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint for Damages - 2486 S Boyd 1.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons (Scan).pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet (Scan).pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilkins, James H.