This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 00:55:03 (UTC).

Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP vs. Kelly Bray

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kelly Bray. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel, Gaab, Kimberly and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1325

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP

Defendants

Seabreeze Developers, Inc., a California Corporation

Sturgill, Andrew

Bray, Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zinkin, Nick

Defendant Attorneys

Cano, Gino

Noory, Hamed

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

42502Complain00869eb

Civil case cover sheet

42502CivilCas02a38e0

Summons issued and filed

42502SummonsS011db3c

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Answer Filed

1896808-Answer to Complaint (Seabreeze.pdf

Answer Filed

1896810-Answer to Complaint (Andrew St.pdf

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: hereby associates: Gino Cano of Law Office of Patrick J. Campbell

Case Management Statement Filed

Dewayne - CMC Pldg FINAL.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

46290CaseMana0014e7e

Case Management Statement Filed

46370CaseMana00e2fcb

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

49379Stipulat006e8d0; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Howard Broadman

Notice of Change of Address Filed

11/18/21 Notice of Change of Address

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 7-12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- 11/18/21 Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed- 49379Stipulat006e8d0; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Howard Broadman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Estimated Time 7-12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Bray, Kelly; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-28969 Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Dewayne Zinkin Family Partnership, LP; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 42502SummonsS011db3c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 42502CivilCas02a38e0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 42502Complain00869eb

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zinkin, Nick