This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/27/2020 at 20:05:16 (UTC).

Deposited Wills July 2019

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Deposited Wills July 2019 was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0600

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Decedents

Yano, Robert L.

Ballard, Melanie V.

Kittredge, Diana M.

Oftedal, Angie

Allan, Kathleen C.

Harder, Michael J.

Motta, Olivina M.

Dean, Lucy

Crumpler, Robert Warren

Samson, Francis David

Linley, Jean A.

Walker, Donald L.

Najera, Arlene S.

Shepherd, Joyce L.

Barrett, Clinton L.

Schmall, Alfred H.

Nielsen, John O.

Schmall, Florence H.

Gomez, Carmen Betancourt

Pitcock, Elbert T.

36 More Parties Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lowe, John S.: Mail Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002853 Randy M. Long $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lowe, John S.: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Lowe, John S.; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bemis, Elizabeth B.: Mail Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002852 Randy M. Long $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bemis, Elizabeth B.: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Bemis, Elizabeth B.; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garcia, Gelacio: Mail Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002851 Fishman, Larsen & Callister $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garcia, Gelacio: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Garcia, Gelacio; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dilldine, Waymon W.: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002809 Wild, Carter & Tipton $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Name of Depositor: Richardson, Jones & Esraelian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kittredge, Diana M.: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002442 Stefanie J. Krause $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kittredge, Diana M.: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Kittredge, Diana M.; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Name of Depositor: Phillip M. Flanigan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Name of Depositor: Stefanie J. Krause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Deposited by: Tomassian & Pimentel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Deposited by: Tomassian & Pimentel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Deposited by: Lisa Elliott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited- Comment: Deposited by: Mederos, Soares, Ormonde & Rascon

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.