This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:31:31 (UTC).

Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc. vs. Vahid Misaghi

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Vahid Misaghi. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0287

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.

Hobab, Hesam

D.D.'s Bakery, A California Corporation

Hobab, Mohammad

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Misaghi, Vahid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schneider, David D

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

 

Court Documents

Ex parte Filed

Ex Parte Application; Comment: NOTICE OF DELI DELICIOUS FRANCHISING, INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT VAHID MISAGHI AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY S

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Peremptory Challenge Filed in court

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to clerk's office for further processing on 2/16/2021** PROPOSED] ORDER ON DELI DELICIOUS FRANCHISING, INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT VAHID MISAGHI AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY S FEES

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge K. Gaab for All Purposes

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: With certificate of mailing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of H. Ty Kharazi Regarding CMC

Appellant Notice Designating Record - CTX, RTX

Appellant's Notice Designating on Appeal; Comment: DCA F082838 Clerk's and Reporter's Transcripts

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil

Notice of Appeal; Comment: Judgment Date: Order Date: 3/30/2021 DCA F082838

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order on OSC Re: Preliminary Injuction and Request for Attorney's f

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: on request for order to show cause and attorney fees

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of H. Ty Kharazi Regarding CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Misaghi, Vahid: Transaction Assessment $1530.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $765.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAppeals Receipt Filed- Comment: 5th DCA Receipt for Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing Civil Appeals- Comment: Document Mailed: Receipt for Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Completion of Transcript on Appeal - Civil- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: David Schneider

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DELI DELICIOUS FRANCHISING, INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT VAHID MISAGHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx parte Filed- Ex Parte Application; Comment: NOTICE OF DELI DELICIOUS FRANCHISING, INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT VAHID MISAGHI AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-05398 Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,320.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- {{FilingCodeDescription}}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less