Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/08/2020 at 16:07:18 (UTC).

Deborah Kinder vs. Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Deborah Kinder filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2629

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kinder, Deborah

Defendants

Clovis Community Medical Center

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Nathan S.

Defendant Attorney

Canepa, Mark B.

 

Court Documents

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-71332 Clovis Community Medical Center $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kinder, Deborah: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-59835 Kinder, Deborah $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kinder, Deborah: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Kinder, Deborah; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clovis Community Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Nathan S.