This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/16/2022 at 12:18:11 (UTC).

Deanna Stanton vs. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Deanna Stanton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1497

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanton, Deanna Lynn

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

a Delaware Corporation

Decker Ford, Inc.

Future Ford of Clovis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobson, Kevin Y.

Defendant Attorney

Tully, Kevin J.

 

Court Documents

5.17.22-Stanton, Deanna v. FMC-Complaint.pdf

05/17/2022: 5.17.22-Stanton, Deanna v. FMC-Complaint.pdf

5.17.22-Stanton, Deanna v. FMC-Civ Case Cover.pdf

05/17/2022: 5.17.22-Stanton, Deanna v. FMC-Civ Case Cover.pdf

5/18/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/18/2022: 5/18/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

5.18.22-Stanton, Deanna v. FMC-Summons.pdf

05/18/2022: 5.18.22-Stanton, Deanna v. FMC-Summons.pdf

5/20/22 Proof of Service

05/20/2022: 5/20/22 Proof of Service

5/20/22 Proof of Service

05/23/2022: 5/20/22 Proof of Service

6-17-22 Defendants' Answer

06/17/2022: 6-17-22 Defendants' Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Decker Ford, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-02169 Decker Ford, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ford Motor Company: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-02170 Decker Ford, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: For WEB-2022-37649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Decker Ford, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Decker Ford, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ford Motor Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Ford Motor Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 05/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Stanton, Deanna Lynn: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-30325 Stanton, Deanna Lynn $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Stanton, Deanna Lynn: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Stanton, Deanna Lynn; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DECKER FORD INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant