This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 04:32:41 (UTC).

David Lopiccolo, II vs. Saint Agnes Medical Center

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 David Lopiccolo, II filed an Other lawsuit against Saint Agnes Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Tharpe, D Tyler and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0679

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Tharpe, D Tyler

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lopiccolo, David Trent, II

Lopiccolo, Rebekah

individually and as successors-in-interest of David Trent Lopiccolo

Defendants

Saint Agnes Medical Center

Trinity Health Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Neill, Sean

Defendant Attorney

Casheros, Jerry D.

 

Court Documents

3/4/22 Complaint

03/04/2022: 3/4/22 Complaint

3/4/22 Summons

03/04/2022: 3/4/22 Summons

3/4/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/04/2022: 3/4/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

3-11-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of Saint Agnes Medical Center

03/11/2022: 3-11-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of Saint Agnes Medical Center

3-11-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of Trinity Health Corporation

03/11/2022: 3-11-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of Trinity Health Corporation

5/4/22 - Answer - Saint Agnes

05/04/2022: 5/4/22 - Answer - Saint Agnes

5-5-22 Request for Dismissal

05/05/2022: 5-5-22 Request for Dismissal

6/15/22 Case Management Statement

06/15/2022: 6/15/22 Case Management Statement

6/15/22 Defendant's Jury Deposit

06/15/2022: 6/15/22 Defendant's Jury Deposit

6/30/2022 - Minute Order Attachment

06/30/2022: 6/30/2022 - Minute Order Attachment

Stipulation RE: ADR

07/12/2022: Stipulation RE: ADR

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated time is 14 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Patrick J. O'Hara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopiccolo, David Trent, II: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-39628 Lopiccolo, David Trent $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopiccolo, David Trent, II: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated time is 14 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Attorney E. Moberg appearing on behalf of attorney Jerry D. Casheros.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 03/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopiccolo, David Trent, II: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-13949 Lopiccolo, David Trent $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopiccolo, David Trent, II: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Lopiccolo, David Trent, II; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Saint Agnes Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Trinity Health Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casheros, Jerry D.