This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:15:05 (UTC).

David Susoev vs. Fiserv Solutions, LLC / LC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 David Susoev filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against Fiserv Solutions, LLC / LC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3539

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Appellant

Fiserv Solutions, LLC

Respondent

Susoev, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Lo, Karina

Respondent Attorney

Brown, Laura E.

 

Court Documents

Labor Commissioner Appeal

11/30/21 - Notice of Labor Commissioner Appeal

Civil case cover sheet

11/30/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Filed

11/30/21 - Notice of Posting Bond; Comment: of Posting Bond

Notice of Hearing

12/02/21 - Notice of Hearing for Labor Commissioner Appeal; Comment: Labor Commissioner Appeal March 2, 2022 at 8:30AM in Dept 404

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: LCA Bond - Total Amount: 74,085.02

11/30/21 - Notice of Labor Commissioner Appeal

11/30/2021: 11/30/21 - Notice of Labor Commissioner Appeal

11/30/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: 11/30/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/21 - Notice of Posting Bond

11/30/2021: 11/30/21 - Notice of Posting Bond

12/02/21 - Notice of Hearing for Labor Commissioner Appeal

12/02/2021: 12/02/21 - Notice of Hearing for Labor Commissioner Appeal

Deposit, payment,disbursment

12/02/2021: Deposit, payment,disbursment

2/23/22 Stipulation and Order Cont Trial

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Stipulation and Order Cont Trial

2-23-22 Stipulation to Continue Trial

02/23/2022: 2-23-22 Stipulation to Continue Trial

Defendants CMC statement 04/20/22

04/18/2022: Defendants CMC statement 04/20/22

Minute Order Attachment

04/20/2022: Minute Order Attachment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Alison Eckstrom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketLabor Commissioner Appeal; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Susoev, David: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-11635 Susoev, David $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Susoev, David: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Susoev, David; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Stipulation to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: FWD to 404 - Stipulation to Continue Trial de novo; Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fiserv Solutions, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-75978 Susoev, David $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fiserv Solutions, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Fiserv Solutions, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: LCA Bond - Total Amount: 74,085.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Labor Commissioner Appeal March 2, 2022 at 8:30AM in Dept 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Posting Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLabor Commissioner Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiserv Solutions is a litigant