This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 05:28:07 (UTC).

David Smith vs. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 David Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0550

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, David

Defendants

Union Pacific Railroad Company

a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rasmussen, Paula

Defendant Attorney

Schroeder, Jeremy J.

 

Court Documents

1/5/22 Sub of Atty

01/05/2022: 1/5/22 Sub of Atty

Civil Document

11/09/2021: Civil Document

20210909Stip re ADR.pdf

09/09/2021: 20210909Stip re ADR.pdf

Association of Attorney/Counsel

07/09/2021: Association of Attorney/Counsel

Minute Order Attachment

07/01/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Jury Deposit Slip.pdf

06/11/2021: Jury Deposit Slip.pdf

Smith CMC.pdf

06/11/2021: Smith CMC.pdf

Case Management Statement

06/09/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

04/27/2021: Proof of Service

Stipulation

04/26/2021: Stipulation

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

03/26/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

POS Re Complaint_Summons.pdf

03/03/2021: POS Re Complaint_Summons.pdf

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

02/25/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons_UP.pdf

02/25/2021: Summons_UP.pdf

Civil_Cover_Sheet.pdf

02/24/2021: Civil_Cover_Sheet.pdf

Smith - Complaint.pdf

02/24/2021: Smith - Complaint.pdf

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 5-12 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Stacey Roberts New Attorney: Jeremy J. Schroeder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled Trial due to change in court closure day.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Hon. Donald Black

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed; Comment: hereby associates: Flesher, Schaff & Schroeder, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketJury Requested by Party; Comment: Estimated 5-12 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 03/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Smith, David: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-10509 Smith, David $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Smith, David: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Smith, David; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/1/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less