This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/03/2020 at 23:06:50 (UTC).

David Lupton McDonald (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 David Lupton McDonald Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0570

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Executor

Migliore, Carrie J.

Decedent

McDonald, David Lupton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

Jaech, Jeffrey A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • HearingInventory and Appraisal (Final)- Comment: Total Amount: $2,070,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingWill Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingLetters (Estates)- Comment: Testamentary (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order Appointing Executor; Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate with full authority (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingPetition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • HearingProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • HearingConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • HearingDuties and Liabilities (Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • HearingPetition (Generic)- Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Migliore, Carrie J.: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002846 Baker, Manock & Jensen $102.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Migliore, Carrie J.: Transaction Assessment $102.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Migliore, Carrie J.: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002780 Baker, Manock & Jensen $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Migliore, Carrie J.: Transaction Assessment $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Migliore, Carrie J.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-46762 Migliore, Carrie J. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Migliore, Carrie J.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Migliore, Carrie J.; Total Financial Assessment $562.50; Total Payments and Credits $562.50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.