This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 07:38:34 (UTC).

David Anthony Tolbert (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 David Anthony Tolbert Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0561

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tolbert, Adam

Decedent

Tolbert, David Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sullivan, J. Patrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • Probate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Probate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Notice of Proposed Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Proof of Publication- Comment: Declaration of Publication - Notice of Intent to Sell Real Property at Private Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Notice Filed- Comment: Notice of Intent to Sell Real Property at Private Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Creditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $15,849.35 CC mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Creditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $1,200.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Creditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $14,337.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Proof of Service- Comment: Proof of Service of Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Inventory and Appraisal (Final)- Comment: Total Amount: $500,00.00

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2019
  • Financial info for Sullivan, J. Patrick: Mail Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00003365 Sullivan & Sullivan $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Financial info for Sullivan, J. Patrick: Transaction Assessment $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Financial info for Sullivan, J. Patrick: Mail Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00002977 Kahn, Soares & Conway LLP $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Financial info for Sullivan, J. Patrick: Transaction Assessment $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Financial: Sullivan, J. Patrick; Total Financial Assessment $51.50; Total Payments and Credits $51.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Financial info for Tolbert, Adam: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00004472 Sullivan and Sullivan $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Financial info for Tolbert, Adam: Transaction Assessment $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Financial info for Tolbert, Adam: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-46220 Tolbert, Adam $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Financial info for Tolbert, Adam: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Financial: Tolbert, Adam; Total Financial Assessment $486.00; Total Payments and Credits $486.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.