This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 12:50:01 (UTC).

Daniel Paredez vs. Harris Ranch Beef Company / COMPLEX / CLASS ACTION / STAYED

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Daniel Paredez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Harris Ranch Beef Company / COMPLEX / CLASS ACTION / STAYED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0108

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paredez, Daniel

individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated

Defendants

Harris Ranch Beef Company

a California corporation

Harris Feeding Company

Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aiwazian, Edwin

Defendant Attorney

Crass, Steven M

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

1/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

1/10/2022 Complaint

Summons issued and filed

1/13/2022 Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

Notice of Entry??of Order

02/22/2023: Notice of Entry??of Order

Stipulation and Order filed

02/17/2023: Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order

02/14/2023: Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order

09.01.2022 Notice of Hearing re: Status of Kings Co. Case Pimentel v. Harris Ranch 21C-0031

09/01/2022: 09.01.2022 Notice of Hearing re: Status of Kings Co. Case Pimentel v. Harris Ranch 21C-0031

08.31.2022 Law & Motion Minute Order with Tentative Ruling and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

08/31/2022: 08.31.2022 Law & Motion Minute Order with Tentative Ruling and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

08.31.2022 Ex Parte Minute Order and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

08/31/2022: 08.31.2022 Ex Parte Minute Order and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

8/30/22 POS ~ Hearing 8/31/22

08/30/2022: 8/30/22 POS ~ Hearing 8/31/22

8/30/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 8/31/22

08/30/2022: 8/30/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 8/31/22

8/30/22 [Proposed] Order ~ Hearing 8/31/22

08/30/2022: 8/30/22 [Proposed] Order ~ Hearing 8/31/22

8/30/22 Ex Parte ~ Hearing 8/31/22

08/30/2022: 8/30/22 Ex Parte ~ Hearing 8/31/22

8/24/2022 Reply In Support of Demurrer

08/24/2022: 8/24/2022 Reply In Support of Demurrer

8/19/22 POS re Opposition Docs HRG 8/31/22

08/19/2022: 8/19/22 POS re Opposition Docs HRG 8/31/22

8/19/22 Shaw Dec re Opp to Dem HRG 8/31/22

08/19/2022: 8/19/22 Shaw Dec re Opp to Dem HRG 8/31/22

8/19/22 Opp to Demurrer HRG 8/31/22

08/19/2022: 8/19/22 Opp to Demurrer HRG 8/31/22

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: stayed pending Kings Co. Case Pimentel v. Harris Ranch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference is GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Paredez, Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-11217 Paredez, Daniel $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Paredez, Daniel: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: FWD to 501 - Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Case Stayed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Status hearing re: Kings Co. Case 21C-0031 Pimentel v. Harris Ranch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: with Tentative Ruling and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in Support of Demurrer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Defendant's Demurrer to Class Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer Filed; Comment: Demurrer to Class Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Paredez, Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-02590 Paredez, Daniel $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Paredez, Daniel: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Paredez, Daniel; Total Financial Assessment $1,685.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,685.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less