This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 12:50:55 (UTC).

Daniel Paredez vs. Harris Feeding Company

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Daniel Paredez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Harris Feeding Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Skiles, Jon M, Brickey, Gabriel and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0104

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Skiles, Jon M

Brickey, Gabriel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paredez, Daniel

Individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act

Defendants

Harris Feeding Company

a California corporation

Harris Ranch Beef Company

Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aiwazian, Edwin

Defendant Attorney

Helsley, Michael S.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

1/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

Civil Complaint filed

1/10/2022 Complaint

Summons issued and filed

1/13/2022 Summons

1/19/2023 CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

01/19/2023: 1/19/2023 CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

9/28/2022-Minute Order Attachment

09/28/2022: 9/28/2022-Minute Order Attachment

9/19/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

09/19/2022: 9/19/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

9/15/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

09/15/2022: 9/15/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

9/14/2022-Notice of Remote Appearance

09/14/2022: 9/14/2022-Notice of Remote Appearance

9-14-22 ADR Stipulation

09/14/2022: 9-14-22 ADR Stipulation

9/13/2022 - Notice of Remote Appearance

09/13/2022: 9/13/2022 - Notice of Remote Appearance

9/13/22 - Case Management Statement - HRG: 9/28/2022

09/13/2022: 9/13/22 - Case Management Statement - HRG: 9/28/2022

63347CaseMana00ac2f3

09/13/2022: 63347CaseMana00ac2f3

5/4/2022-Notice of Posting Jury Fees

05/04/2022: 5/4/2022-Notice of Posting Jury Fees

5/4/2022 Answer

05/04/2022: 5/4/2022 Answer

04.28.2022 Order to continue CMC from 05.11.2022 to 09.28.2022 @ 3:30 p.m. in Dept. 402

04/28/2022: 04.28.2022 Order to continue CMC from 05.11.2022 to 09.28.2022 @ 3:30 p.m. in Dept. 402

4/27/22 Cont CMC

04/27/2022: 4/27/22 Cont CMC

3/10/2022-Proof of Service of Summons (Harris Ranch Been Company)

03/10/2022: 3/10/2022-Proof of Service of Summons (Harris Ranch Been Company)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Change

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Attorney B. Shaw special appearing on behalf of attorney Edwin Aiwazian Attorney S. Crass special appearing on behalf of attorney Michael S. Helsley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketJury Requested by Party; Comment: Estimated time for trial is 15 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Regarding Remote Appearance Granted; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Comment: Party: Harris Feeding Company; Harris Ranch Beef Company; Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall Order Granted as to any and all case management conference only. Approval is to appear using audio only through Courtcall per CCP 367.75 (b). Any requests for future hearings need to be resubmitted to be reviewed by the Judge assigned for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 402 Order for: Remote Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Paredez, Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-02585 Paredez, Daniel $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Paredez, Daniel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Paredez, Daniel; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less