This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/27/2022 at 18:06:30 (UTC).

Daniel Clark vs Candice Clark

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Daniel Clark filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Candice Clark. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Luna, Irene and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3760

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Luna, Irene

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clark, Daniel

Respondent

Clark, Candice

Minor

Clark, Rachel Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Abrams, Robert C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion; Judicial Officer: Luna, Irene; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: cc, cv

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clark, Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-56432 Clark, Daniel $525.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clark, Daniel: Transaction Assessment $525.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Clark, Daniel; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion - Re: Custody/Visitation; Comment: Hrg 10/31/22 @ 1:30 in dept 204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abrams, Robert C