This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 16:01:35 (UTC).

Crystal Stansberry vs. Sierra Meadows Senior Living LLC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Crystal Stansberry filed an Other lawsuit against Sierra Meadows Senior Living LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Brickey, Gabriel and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0807

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stansberry, Crystal

Huff, Bob

Huff, Garry

Huff, James

Defendant

Sierra Meadows Senior Living LLC

Nominal Defendants

Huff, Robert

Huff, Robbie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Stephen M.

 

Court Documents

3/16/2022 Complaint

03/16/2022: 3/16/2022 Complaint

3/16/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/16/2022: 3/16/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2022 Summons

03/17/2022: 3/17/2022 Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

03/17/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

3/28/2022-Proof of Service (Robert Huff)

03/28/2022: 3/28/2022-Proof of Service (Robert Huff)

4-18-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint re: Robbie Huff

04/18/2022: 4-18-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint re: Robbie Huff

6/3/2022-Notice of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Hrg: 8/24/2022

06/03/2022: 6/3/2022-Notice of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Hrg: 8/24/2022

6/3/2022-Declaration in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Hrg: 8/24/2022

06/03/2022: 6/3/2022-Declaration in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Hrg: 8/24/2022

6/3/2022-Proposed Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Hrg: 8/24/2022

06/03/2022: 6/3/2022-Proposed Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Hrg: 8/24/2022

6/6/22 Proof of Service

06/06/2022: 6/6/22 Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketMotion - Withdrawal of Attorney; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Steven Garcia (Filed 6/3/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Stansberry, Crystal: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-34015 Stansberry, Crystal $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Stansberry, Crystal: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Service of Motion and Supporting Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: (Pending Hearing) Proposed Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 04/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Stansberry, Crystal: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-17136 Stansberry, Crystal $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Stansberry, Crystal: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Stansberry, Crystal; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Meadows Senior Living, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL