This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 06:05:00 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. Jose Martinez

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Martinez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0552

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

Defendant

Martinez, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siduguen, Christine

Defendant Attorney

Harutyunyan, Shahane

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

RSIEH_4093232_com_eABC.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

RSIEH_4093232_ccs_eABC.pdf

Declaration Filed

RSIEH_4093232_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Re: Venue

Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

RSIEH_4093232_rfe_eABC.pdf

Summons issued and filed

RSIEH_4093232_sum_eABC.pdf

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 3/24/22

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached- Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 3/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Martinez, Jose: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-12964 Martinez, Jose $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Martinez, Jose: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Martinez, Jose; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crown Asset Management, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-03979 Crown Asset Management, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crown Asset Management, LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Crown Asset Management, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- RSIEH_4093232_sum_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed- RSIEH_4093232_rfe_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- RSIEH_4093232_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- RSIEH_4093232_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- RSIEH_4093232_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARUTYUNYAN SHAHANE