This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 09:17:56 (UTC).

County of Tulare vs Gustavo Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 County of Tulare filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against Gustavo Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pebet, Noelle. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1912

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Tulare

Respondent

Gonzalez, Gustavo P

Minor

Lopez, Isaac

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMotion Modify Child Support- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: MMCS. Hrg: 01-24-2022 1:15 p.m. Dept. 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice regarding Payment of Support- Comment: Substituted payee: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Date mailed: 9/15/21 Served: Gustavo Gonzalez & Adriana Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRegistration FSD California Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRegistration FSD California Order- Comment: From Tulare County.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF TULARE is a litigant