This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:10:10 (UTC).

County of Tulare vs EDDIE GRINNER, JR

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 County of Tulare filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against EDDIE GRINNER, JR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1792

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Tulare

Respondent

GRINNER, EDDIE, JR

Minors

GRINNER, EDDIE R, III

GRINNER, AAIDEN R

GRINNER, MELODY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDCSS Supplemental Summons and Complaint FL-600- Comment: 1st Supplemental 1st Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDCSS Supplemental Summons and Complaint FL-600- Comment: 1st Supplemental.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Aiyla Ellis. Date mailed: 08/26/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Eddie Grinner, JR. Date mailed: 08/26/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice regarding Payment of Support- Comment: Substituted payee: County of Fresno DCSS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketRegistration FSD California Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketRegistration FSD California Order- Comment: From Tulare County.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF TULARE is a litigant