This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 13:41:38 (UTC).

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE VS ANGEL M ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ANGEL M ORTEGA. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2358

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Riverside

Respondent

Ortega, Angel M

Minors

Ortega, Marina Marie

Ortega, Maribel G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDCSS Supplemental Summons and Complaint FL-600- Comment: 1st Supplemental

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice regarding Payment of Support- Comment: substituted payee - Fresno County Department of Child Support Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRegistration FSD California Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRegistration FSD California Order- Comment: From the County of Riverside

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE (DOE 3) is a litigant