This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/11/2020 at 19:14:51 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs VANCE MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against VANCE MITCHELL. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2010

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

MITCHELL, VANCE R

Minor

MITCHELL, DYLAN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment FS; Party Names: MITCHELL, VANCE R; COUNTY OF FRESNO; MITCHELL, DYLAN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • HearingProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Vance R Mitchell \ Date mailed: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment- Comment: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgmen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingProposed Documents- Comment: Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations (Gover

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingDocuments sent to- Comment: signed electronic Judgment to FSD Clerk's Office for processing and scanning of printed document.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • HearingRequest to Enter Default- Comment: Request to Enter Default Judgment (Governmenta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • HearingProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Served Vance R Mitchell 7-5-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less