This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 19:02:10 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs RUDY SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against RUDY SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel and Pebet, Noelle. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2014

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

SANCHEZ, RUDY

Minors

SANCHEZ, CRUZ H

SANCHEZ, EMMA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: SANCHEZ, RUDY; COUNTY OF FRESNO; SANCHEZ, CRUZ H; SANCHEZ, EMMA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCommissioner Dalesandro Minute Order See Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMotion - Joinder- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketGeneral Motion- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Parentage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMotion - Health Care- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Respondent: SANCHEZ, RUDY; Parties Present- Petitioner: COUNTY OF FRESNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Child Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Served: Rudy Sanchez & Rebecca Sanchez | Mailed: 8/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Parent Joinder Hrg 10/22/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Parentage Hrg 10/22/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Health Care Hrg 10/22/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Judgment Hrg 10/22/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion - Re: Child Support- Comment: Hrg 10/22/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed Family Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Served Rudy Sanchez on 07/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less