This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 18:05:24 (UTC).

DISMISSED - COUNTY OF FRESNO vs RICARDO PONCE

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 DISMISSED - COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against RICARDO PONCE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0041

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

PONCE, RICARDO

Minor

AUGUSTINE, ONYX Z

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other FL/FS; Party Names: PONCE, RICARDO; COUNTY OF FRESNO; AUGUSTINE, ONYX Z; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Party served: Ricardo Ponce on 01/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPaternity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less