This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 19:08:09 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs MAURICIO AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Other case was filed by COUNTY OF FRESNO against MAURICIO AGUILAR in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2027

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

AGUILAR, MAURICIO

Minor

AGUILAR, STELLA G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment FSD; Party Names: AGUILAR, MAURICIO; COUNTY OF FRESNO; AGUILAR, STELLA G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: To FSD Clerk's office for entry and scanning of the signed FSD Stip Judgment. The conformed copies of the FSD Stip Judgment were placed in the DCSS pick up bin. No file provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Proof of Service- Comment: Personal Service\ Party served: Mauricio Aguilar \ Date served: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Family Support Examiner - Stipulation For Judgment for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Filed Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less