This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/10/2020 at 17:41:46 (UTC).

County of Fresno vs Juan Garcia-Perez

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 County of Fresno filed an Other lawsuit against Juan Garcia-Perez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jones, Heather M, Hopper, Cindy and Hamilton, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3665

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jones, Heather M

Hopper, Cindy

Hamilton, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

GARCIA-PEREZ, JUAN CARLOS

Minor

RENTERIA, ANGELO F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMotion - Joinder- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jennifer; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketGeneral Motion- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jennifer; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMotion - Health Care- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jennifer; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jennifer; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jennifer; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Parties served: Juan Carlos Garcia-Perez and Lizette Susana Gomez Renteria / Date mailed: 6/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Juan Carlos Garcia-Perez and Liset Susana Gomez Renteria. Date mailed: 05/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Juan Carlos Garcia Perez, Lizette Susana Gomez Renteria. Date mailed: 04/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service- Comment: Date mailed: 5/8/2020 Served: Juan Carlos Garcia-Perez & Lizette Susana Gomez Renteria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCommissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached- Comment: D302/Comm. Hopper Clerk: Rbenavente Petitioner: CSA John Dyer Respondent: present/pro per Hrg type: Mtns: Entry judgment, Initial OSC, Mtn HC, Gen Mtn, Mtn Joinder FTR: 2:15:39 Continued: 3/27/2020 at 8am D302 - Mtns: Entry judgment, Initial OSC, Mtn HC, Gen Mtn, Mtn Joinder Court reserves back to 12/1/19 Other: see attachment Attachment: Oral advisement given pursuant to Family Code Section 4251 as stated on the record. No objection made. Proof of Service filed is defective and matter is set out to allow service to lapse. Local Child Support Agency is to notify the other parent a courtesy notice for the continuance date. Court reserves retroactivity pursuant to Family Code Section 4009. No DCSS # listed, line #22

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Original Type: Motion for Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketResponsive Declaration- Comment: Response to Governmental Notice of Motion or Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Date mailed: 1/31/2020 Served: Juan Carlos Garcia-Perez & Lizette Susana Gomez Renteria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPaternity- Comment: 02/20/20 at 8am in D302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Motion: judgment/CS/HC/Parentage/Joinder 02/20/20 at 8am in D302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed Family Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Party Served: Juan Carlos Garcia -Perez on 12/07/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less