This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 18:14:29 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs GABRIEL DE ANDA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against GABRIEL DE ANDA. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3660

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

DE ANDA, GABRIEL P

Minor

DEANDA, JOHNATHAN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Gabriel P De Anda & Jessica A De Anda \ Date mailed: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment FS; Party Names: DE ANDA, GABRIEL P; COUNTY OF FRESNO; DEANDA, JOHNATHAN P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment- Comment: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgmen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations (Gover

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: signed electronic Judgment to FSD Clerk's Office for processing and scanning of printed document.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Comment: Request to Enter Default Judgment (Governmenta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Party served by substituted service: Gabriel De Anda Jr, son \ Date served: 12/01/19 \ Filed Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.