This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/06/2020 at 14:28:39 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs ANTHONY TIRADO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against ANTHONY TIRADO. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Pebet, Noelle and Hopper, Cindy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3666

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Pebet, Noelle

Hopper, Cindy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

TIRADO, ANTHONY JUSTIN

Minors

TIRADO, KHALEESI KYLEE

TIRADO, CAMBRIA KAIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Morrison, Jennifer S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketGeneral Motion- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Comment: Parentage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMotion for Health Care (Family Support)- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMotion Child Support- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Date Mailed: 06/24/2020 Party Served: Anthony Justin Tirado & Marissa D. Garcia & Jennifer S. Morrison & Joseph Arnold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party servd: Anthony Justin TIrando, Marissa D Garcia, Jennifer S Morrison and Joseph M Arnold. Date mailed: 06/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: NOTICE OF NON AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney- Comment: MC-050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Date mailed: 5/4/2020 Served: Anthony Justin Tirado, Marissa D Garcia & Jennifer S Morrison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Party served: Anthony Justin Tirado and Marissa D Garcia and Jennifer S Morrison. Date mailed: 03/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMotion - Health Care- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Comment: CS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Parties Present- Respondent; Parties Present- Attorney: Morrison, Jennifer S.; Parties Present- Petitioner: COUNTY OF FRESNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney- Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Parties served: Anthony Justin Tirado and Marissa D Garcia. Date mailed: 12/30/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPaternity- Comment: 02/03/20 at 8am in D301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Motion: judgment/CS/HC/Parentage/Joinder 02/03/20 at 8am in D301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed Family Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service- Comment: Served Anthony Justin Tirado 11-25-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.