This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 20:01:48 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs ALEXANDRA MCGINNIS

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against ALEXANDRA MCGINNIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hopper, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hopper, Cindy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

MCGINNIS, ALEXANDRA PERRY

Minors

MCGINNIS, ALIJAH NICHOLS

MCGINNIS, AMARI PATRICK

MCGINNIS, ALISAMARIE ALEXANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Hawkins, Erik D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Date mailed: 1/27/2020 Served: Alexandra Perry McGinnis, Patrick Decosta McGinnis Jr. & Erik D Hawkins esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: MCGINNIS, ALEXANDRA PERRY; MCGINNIS, ALISAMARIE ALEXANDRA; MCGINNIS, AMARI PATRICK; MCGINNIS, ALIJAH NICHOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice regarding Payment of Support- Comment: Substituted Payee is Patrick Decosta McGinnis Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCommissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMotion - Joinder- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Respondent: MCGINNIS, ALEXANDRA PERRY; Parties Present- Attorney: Hawkins, Erik D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMotion - Health Care- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: child support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney- Comment: HRG 1/9/2020 - SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCommissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached- Comment: D302/Commissioner Hopper Clerk: RBenavente Petitioner: CSA Lacee O'Brien Respondent: present/Atty Hawkins Other parent: Atty McCracken Hrg type: Initial OSC/Mtn, Mtn Entry judgment, Mtn HC, Mtn Joinder FTR: 8:55:41 Continued: 1/9/20 at 8am D301 - Initial OSC/Mtn, Mtn Entry judgment, Mtn HC, Mtn Joinder Court reserves back to 8/1/19 Other: see attachment Attachment: Oral advisement given pursuant to Family Code Section 4251 as stated on the record. No objection made. Attorney McCracken is present and states she is authorized to go forward on behalf of the other parent. Attorney Hawkins would like to resolve today the issues of timeshare for custody/visitation and health insurance payments that respondent (Alexandra McGinnis) is paying on. Attorney McCracken states she is not prepared today to argue the issue of custody/visitation and whether or not respondent is paying the health insurance issues and her client was unable to be present today. Court sets matter out to allow the other parent to be present and parties to go to Family Law court hearing then come to Department 302 once done. The issues will be anything that affects the guideline calculations. If necessary the court can set a contested hearing, if requested. The court will make a temporary order. A guideline support calculation has been prepared and provided to court and parties. Temporary Child support is set at $228.00 beginning on 11/1/19 for respondent (Alexandra MCGinnis) to pay, payable in full on the first of each month and continuing until further order of the court or pursuant to the code. Allocations for child support was not stated on the record. DCSS #200000002199603 line #16

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Join other Parent Hrg 10/01/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Health Care Hrg 10/01/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Judgment Hrg 10/01/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion - Re: Child Support- Comment: Hrg 10/01/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Served Alexandra Perry McGinnis on 07/08/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Served Alexandra Perry Mcginnis 7-2-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney- Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration- Comment: FL-150 Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed Family Support- Comment: FL-610 Answer to Complaint Re: Parental Obligations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less