This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/10/2020 at 19:13:11 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO vs ALEXANDER RIVERA

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against ALEXANDER RIVERA. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hopper, Cindy and Jones, Heather M. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hopper, Cindy

Jones, Heather M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

RIVERA, ALEXANDER J

Minor

MEJIA, SAMMUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: RIVERA, ALEXANDER J; COUNTY OF FRESNO; MEJIA, SAMMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCommissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached- Comment: D302/Commissioner Hopper Clerk: RBenavente Petitioner: CSA Linda Branch Respondent: Other parent: Hrg type: FTR: Other: see attachment Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCommissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMotion - Genetic Test- Original Type: Motion - Genetic Test; Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: (results)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketGeneral Motion- Original Type: General Motion; Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: (Parentage); Parties Present- Respondent: RIVERA, ALEXANDER J; Parties Present- Petitioner: COUNTY OF FRESNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMotion - Health Care- Original Type: Motion - Health Care; Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Judgment- Original Type: Motion for Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion- Original Type: Initial OSC/Motion; Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail- Comment: Parties Served: Alexander J Rivera & Esmerelda A Mejia on 10/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCommissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached- Comment: D302/Commissioner Hopper Clerk: RBenavente FTR: 9:13:12 Petitioner: CSA Nellie Peloian Respondent/Other parent: present/pro per/sworn Hrg type: Initial OSC/Mtn, HC, Entry judgment, Parentage, Joinder Continued: 11/22/19 at 8am D302 - Initial OSC/Mtn, HC, Entry judgment, Parentage, Joinder Court reserves back to 8/1/19 Other: see attachment Attachment: Oral advisement given pursuant to Family Code Section 4251 as stated on the record. No objection made. CSA informed the court that respondent (Alexander Rivera) has completed his testing already and the mother has missed 5 testing appointments. Court orders that the mother and the child to be tested this morning and she is ordered to go over and take the child now to have the test completed. Matter is set over for genetic test results with all other issues to trail. Court joins the mother to the case. Court sua sponte, the Local Child Support Agency is to send notices to the parties of the continuance date and they are to put in the letter that if the parents are minors themselves then they are to bring a guardian with them to the next court date. DCSS #200000002202055 line #18

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Genetic Testing Hrg 10/08/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Parentage Hrg 10/08/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Health Care Hrg 10/08/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Comment: Judgment Hrg 10/08/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketInitial OSC/Motion - Re: Child Support- Comment: Hrg 10/08/19 @08:00 a.m. in D-302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed Family Support- Comment: Resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Party served by substituted service: Jane DOE, refused name, resident \ Date served: 07/16/2019 \ Filed Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less