This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 18:05:21 (UTC).

DISMISSED - COUNTY OF FRESNO vs ADAN HUANTE

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 DISMISSED - COUNTY OF FRESNO filed an Other lawsuit against ADAN HUANTE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0047

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

HUANTE, ADAN

Minors

HUANTE, ROMEO TORRES

HUANTE, CATALEYA TORRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint- Comment: Party served by substituted service: Rafael 'DOE', Refused last name, Father/ Date Served: 01/28/2020. Filed Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other FL/FS; Party Names: HUANTE, ADAN; COUNTY OF FRESNO; HUANTE, ROMEO TORRES; HUANTE, CATALEYA TORRES; Comment: S&C filed on 01/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest To Enter Dismissal- Comment: Summons and Complaint filed on 01/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons- Comment: Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less