This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 12:15:00 (UTC).

Constance Luczo vs. The TJX Companies, INC

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Constance Luczo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The TJX Companies, INC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3283

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luczo, Constance

Defendants

TJ Maxx #1033

TJX Companies

The TJX Companies, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Paul M., II

Defendant Attorney

Vucinich, Jeffrey M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Proof of Service

11-30-21 Proof of Service Of TJ Maxx #1033; Comment: DEFECTIVE Reason : Line #3.a. is incomplete; line #5.c.(4) was marked; however no proof of return receipt was attached.

Proof of Service

11-30-21 Proof of Service of TJ Maxx #1033 (defective)

Answer Filed

12/1/2021 Answer

Notice Filed

12/6/21 Notice Posting Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for The TJX Companies, INC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-76702 The TJX Companies, INC $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for The TJX Companies, INC: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 12/6/21 Notice Posting Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for The TJX Companies, INC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-76137 TJX Companies $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for The TJX Companies, INC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: The TJX Companies, INC; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- 12/1/2021 Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint- Comment: DEFECTIVE Reason : Line #5.a. states defendant listed in #3.a. was personally served; however the defendant is not a person; therefore you cannot personally serve a building.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 11-30-21 Proof of Service of TJ Maxx #1033 (defective)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 11-30-21 Proof of Service Of TJ Maxx #1033; Comment: DEFECTIVE Reason : Line #3.a. is incomplete; line #5.c.(4) was marked; however no proof of return receipt was attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Luczo, Constance: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-70148 Luczo, Constance $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Luczo, Constance: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Luczo, Constance; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vucinich, Jeffrey M