This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 15:32:50 (UTC).

Commercial Trade, INC. vs. Steven McDonald

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Commercial Trade, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Steven McDonald. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7304

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commercial Trade, INC.

Defendants

McDonald, Steven Wayne

McDonald, Steven W

McDonald, Melody Jean

McDonald, Melody J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCormack, Sandra K.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set on 01/19/2022 at 03:30 p.m., in Department 402.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: non service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: The document(s) received via mail on 10/21/2021 are being returned unprocessed because the forms submitted are the incorrect forms to file a response in this particular case. Also, the court requires a filing fee of $225.00 or an Application and Order for Waiver of Court Fees (FW-001 & FW-003) to file a response. Please seek legal advice in which forms to file from Central California Legal Services at (559) 570-1200 or any law firm.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

12/15/2021 - Proof of Service; Comment: Melody Jean McDonald

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Request to Enter Default

12/29/2021- Request for Clerk's Judgment

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

12/29/2021- Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes; Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Judgment Received

12/29/2021- Judgment; Comment: Judgment

Abstract of Judgment Issued

1/11/22-Abstract; Comment: Amount: $5,547.20

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, INC.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-02151 Commercial Trade, INC. $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, INC.: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued- 1/11/22-Abstract; Comment: Amount: $5,547.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- 12/29/2021- Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Commercial Trade, INC.; McDonald, Steven Wayne; McDonald, Melody Jean; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Commercial Trade, INC.; Awarded Against:; McDonald, Steven Wayne; McDonald, Melody Jean; Amount; Damages: $4,036.14; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $181.34; Attorney Fees: $807.22; Costs: $522.50; Total: $5547.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received- 12/29/2021- Judgment; Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- 12/29/2021- Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes; Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- 12/29/2021- Request for Clerk's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: non service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, INC.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-60823 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, INC.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Commercial Trade, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $265.00; Total Payments and Credits $265.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set on 01/19/2022 at 03:30 p.m., in Department 402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN