This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 08:49:07 (UTC).

Commercial Trade, Inc. vs. Clear Drain Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Commercial Trade, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clear Drain Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7262

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commercial Trade, Inc.

Defendants

Clear Drain Corporation

Clear Drain Plumbing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCormack, Sandra K.

Defendant Attorney

Rousso, Nora

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Conference

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order filed

02/10/2022: Stipulation and Order filed

02/08/2022-Request for Dismissal

02/08/2022: 02/08/2022-Request for Dismissal

02/08/2022-Stipulation and Order

02/08/2022: 02/08/2022-Stipulation and Order

Minute Order Attachment

01/04/2022: Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

12/17/2021: Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

12/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service as to Clear Drain Corp

12/10/2021: Proof of Service as to Clear Drain Corp

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

09/24/2021: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

09/24/2021: Summons

Complaint

09/22/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Commercial Trade, Inc.; Clear Drain Corporation; Comment: Court retains jurisdiction per CCP664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clear Drain Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-08625 Clear Drain Corporation $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clear Drain Corporation: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Clear Drain Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 on 02/09/22 Order for: stipulation and order for conditional structured settlement CCP664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-60411 Commercial Trade, Inc. $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Commercial Trade, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant