This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 11:24:59 (UTC).

City of Fresno vs Willie Thomas

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 City of Fresno filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Willie Thomas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0288

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Fresno

Defendant

Thomas, Willie Albert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Costa, Kristi M

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Statement of Damages

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Thomas, Willie Albert; City of Fresno; Comment: With Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Thomas, Willie Albert; City of Fresno; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Statement of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Financial: City of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi Marie Costa