This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 16:06:38 (UTC).

City of Fresno vs Ray Johnson

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 City of Fresno filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ray Johnson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0208

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Fresno

a municipal corporation

Defendants

Johnson, Ray

Halliburton, Deborah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Banuelos, Jesse

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

1/20/22 - Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

1/20/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

1/20/22 - Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Notice Filed

1/25/2022-Notice of Commencement of Action; Comment: Notice of Commencement of Action

1/20/22 - Complaint

01/20/2022: 1/20/22 - Complaint

1/20/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/20/2022: 1/20/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/22 - Summons

01/21/2022: 1/20/22 - Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

01/21/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

1/25/2022-Notice of Commencement of Action

01/25/2022: 1/25/2022-Notice of Commencement of Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Commencement of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for City of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for City of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: City of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a municipal corporation and a chartered city is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Banuelos, Jesse