This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 16:54:35 (UTC).

City of Fresno vs. Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 City of Fresno filed an Other lawsuit against Fresno Building Healthy Communities. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0422

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Fresno

Defendant

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stokes, Travis R.

Defendant Attorney

Caplan, Deborah B.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

04/07/2021: Minute Order Attachment

3/1/22 Suppl Declaration HRG 3/8/22

03/01/2022: 3/1/22 Suppl Declaration HRG 3/8/22

Declaration

07/23/2021: Declaration

3-7-22 Notice Re Proofs of Service of Defendant's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees

03/07/2022: 3-7-22 Notice Re Proofs of Service of Defendant's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees

Case Management Statement

09/05/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration

02/23/2022: Declaration

03.02.22 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Supplemental Declaration HRG 03.08.22

03/02/2022: 03.02.22 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Supplemental Declaration HRG 03.08.22

Declaration

07/23/2021: Declaration

3/1/22 Def Reply HRG 3/8/22

03/01/2022: 3/1/22 Def Reply HRG 3/8/22

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMotion - Attorney Fees; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Tom Willis (filed 7/23/21)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Notice Re Proofs of Service of Defendant's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse filed; Comment: Defendant's Response to Objections To Supplemental Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Supplemental Declaration HRG 03.08.22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Supplemental Declaration of Deborah B. Caplan In Support of Defendant's Reply To Opposition to Motion For Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed; Comment: Defendant's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: 3/8/22 Declaration of Travis R. Stokes ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-46027 Fresno Building Healthy Communities $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx parte Filed; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Answer in Intervention

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 02/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for City of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for City of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: City of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes (Judge Kimberly A. Gaab)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less