This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 15:16:51 (UTC).

City of Coalinga vs. Pacific Gas and Electric

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 City of Coalinga filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Pacific Gas and Electric. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1964

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Coalinga

Defendant

Pacific Gas and Electric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zamora, Mario U.

 

Court Documents

6-28-22 Complaint

06/28/2022: 6-28-22 Complaint

6-28-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/28/2022: 6-28-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

6-28-22 Summons

06/28/2022: 6-28-22 Summons

6-28-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

06/28/2022: 6-28-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

7/12/22 Proof of Service ~ DEFECTIVE

07/12/2022: 7/12/22 Proof of Service ~ DEFECTIVE

7/18/22 - Proof of Service

07/18/2022: 7/18/22 - Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketGeneral Motion; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Order for Possession ~ Mario Zamora

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: DEFECTIVE ~ Document is not in compliance with Mandatory Form POS-010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAMORA MARIO UNSER