This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/16/2020 at 16:00:29 (UTC).

Chris Rilea vs. Kasco Fab, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Chris Rilea filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kasco Fab, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2424

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rilea, Chris

Klassen Corporation

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Kasco Fab, Inc.

Klassen Corporation

American Crane Rental, Inc.

Cross Plaintiff

Moes 1 through 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Bell, Steven J.

Smith, T. Mark

Sell, James E

Cross Defendant Attorney

Blaisdell, Benjamin W.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Cross Complaint

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice Filed

4010356_9827760663AC; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Answer Filed

4010356_8427760663AC

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint by Klassen Corporation

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: 2nd Cross-Complaint filed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice Of Lien Pursuant To Labor Code 3850-3865; Request to Be Placed on Proof of Service List for All Pleadings and Discovery

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for Purposes

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for American Crane Rental, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-73332 American Crane Rental, Inc. $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for American Crane Rental, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: American Crane Rental, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Klassen Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-73421 Klassen Corporation $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Klassen Corporation: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 4010356_9827760663AC; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- 4010356_8427760663AC

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice Of Lien Pursuant To Labor Code 3850-3865; Request to Be Placed on Proof of Service List for All Pleadings and Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rilea, Chris: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-55493 RILEA, CHRIS $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rilea, Chris: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Rilea, Chris; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KLASSEN CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELL, JAMES EGAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, T MARK