This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 19:50:37 (UTC).

Cheri Barkley vs. Team 5 Properties / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Cheri Barkley filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Team 5 Properties / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0229

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cortez, Alma

Barkley, Cheri

He, Siu

Bath, Veronica

Kaur, Sukhwinder

Lu, Zhi

Lonjin, Alan

Criego, Franz

Warde, Amy

Mora, Mark

Bath, Rexford

Mora, Ryann

Virk, Rupinder

Chahal, Dharamjit

Chavez, Alma

Corbin, Amy

Virk, Sandeep

Thai, Tuan

Chahal, Harpreet

Defendant

Team 5 Properties

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fairchild, Michael K

Defendant Attorney

Nordstrom, Adrienne E

Other Attorneys

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Boardman, Nora R.

Murphy, Jason M.

Vairetta, Wendi N.

Cohen, Adrienne D.

Vote, Kurt F.

Blaisdell, Benjamin W.

Toohey, John H.

Harris, David A

Pearsall, Todd P

Silva, Dirk E

McElroy, Julie D.

Van De Poel, John

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

39489ProofofS004f2f3

Civil case cover sheet

4210947_661CivilCase

Summons issued and filed

4210947_664Summons12

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

4210947_199OC11921.p

4/18/2022 Answer

04/18/2022: 4/18/2022 Answer

3/28/22 Sub of Atty - Bulrad Enterprises

03/28/2022: 3/28/22 Sub of Atty - Bulrad Enterprises

03/15/2022 Dismissal of Party

03/15/2022: 03/15/2022 Dismissal of Party

3/10/22 - Summons on 3rd Cross Complaint

03/11/2022: 3/10/22 - Summons on 3rd Cross Complaint

3/10/22 - Proof of Service

03/10/2022: 3/10/22 - Proof of Service

3/10/22 - Objection

03/10/2022: 3/10/22 - Objection

3/10/22 - 3rd Cross Complaint

03/10/2022: 3/10/22 - 3rd Cross Complaint

3/10/22 - Answer to 1st Cross Complaint - Meraz Roofing

03/10/2022: 3/10/22 - Answer to 1st Cross Complaint - Meraz Roofing

3/8/22 Proof of Service

03/08/2022: 3/8/22 Proof of Service

3/8/22 Notice of Remote Appearance

03/08/2022: 3/8/22 Notice of Remote Appearance

03.04.22 Minute Order from chambers

03/04/2022: 03.04.22 Minute Order from chambers

2-28-22 Answer to Cross-Complaint of Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. (Roe 25)

02/28/2022: 2-28-22 Answer to Cross-Complaint of Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. (Roe 25)

53864CaseMana00cbe43

02/23/2022: 53864CaseMana00cbe43

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-23963 Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc. $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Donald P. Dick Air Conditioning, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Westech Systems, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-01108 Westech Systems, Inc. $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: For WEB-2022-03978

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Westech Systems, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Westech Systems, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Westech Systems, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 02/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barkley, Cheri: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-04035 Barkley, Cheri $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barkley, Cheri: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Barkley, Cheri; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less