This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 13:15:50 (UTC).

Charles Maxwell vs. Fresno County Sportsmen's Club, a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Charles Maxwell filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fresno County Sportsmen's Club, a California Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1451

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maxwell, Charles H.

Defendant

Fresno County Sportsmen's Club, a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kinsey, John P

Sanchez, Giulio A.

 

Court Documents

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/21

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 9/14/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Hrg: 9/14/21 Case Management Statement

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

11/30/21 - Notice of Entry of Dismissal

11/30/2021: 11/30/21 - Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice

09/14/2021: Notice

Notice of Jury Deposit

09/07/2021: Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement

09/07/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice

07/28/2021: Notice

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/21/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons

05/21/2021: Summons

Complaint

05/20/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Comment: of Entry of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Maxwell, Charles H.; Fresno County Sportsmen's Club, a California Corporation; Comment: without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maxwell, Charles H.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-56389 Maxwell, Charles H. $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maxwell, Charles H.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Hrg: 9/14/21 Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maxwell, Charles H.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-31727 Maxwell, Charles H. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maxwell, Charles H.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Maxwell, Charles H.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 9/14/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less