This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 03:46:10 (UTC).

Cesar Suarez Villarruel vs Ireri Cervantez Contreras

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Cesar Suarez Villarruel filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ireri Cervantez Contreras. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kalemkarian, David and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1282

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kalemkarian, David

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O

Respondent

Cervantez Contreras, Ireri D.

Minors

Suarez Cervantez, Angel Damian

Suarez Cervantez, Cesar Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Marital Status Ends: 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketStatus-Only Judgment- Comment: Marital Status Ends: 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Notice of Entry Judgement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed- Comment: to Atty Kharazi: MO filed 7/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJudge Gamoian Minute Order: See Attached- Comment: Dept: 304 Judge: L. Gamoian Clerk: C. Vang Reporter: J. Hannickel Petitioner: Present; Sworn; COunsel: T. Kharaxi via zoom Respondent: Not Present Hearing Type: Notice of Motion; Bifurcation Interpreter: A. Lopez-Crtroom for Spanish for Petitioner Other: Court calls matter and trails it to allow the Spanish interpreter to be present. Court recalls the matter at 9:39am. Petitioner is present via his respective counsel's zoom device and is being assisted by the court certified Spanish interpreter. The Court finds there was proper service. Court notes Petitioner's preliminary and final declaration of disclosure filed on 05/20/2021 in the court's file. The Court finds good cause pursuant to Family Code Section 2107(b)(3) to allow Petitioner to waive receipt of the preliminary declaration of disclosure from Respondent. The matter proceeds as an uncontested dissolution of marriage. The Court makes the following findings: Irreconcilable differences have arisen causing a complete and irremediable breakdown of the marriage such that no period of counseling or waiting would help restore the marital relationship. Motion for Bifurcation is granted. Status Only Judgment granted. Court acquired jurisdiction on 04/08/2021 per the Proof of Service of the Summons and Petition. Judgment effective upon date of filing. All other issues are reserved. Attorney Kharazi is to prepare the Status Only Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketGeneral Motion- Original Type: General Motion; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Bifurcation set by Ty Kharazi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-32640 Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketOSC/Motions filed- Comment: hrg 07/26/21 @ 9 AM in dept 304 with zoom info emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-20467 Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Suarez Villarruel, Cesar O; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProperty Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S