This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 18:51:00 (UTC).

Cesar Picone vs. RV Country, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Cesar Picone filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RV Country, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler, McGuire, Rosemary and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4338

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Picone, Cesar Gustavo

Defendants

Curtis, Charles E

RV Country, Inc.

Everet, Paul

Power, Charlie

Cantrell, Dale

Paul Everet

Paul Evert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whelan, Brian D

Defendant Attorneys

Perkins, Michael K

Ranen, Jeffrey S

Kruthers, Mark D.

Wilkins, James H.

 

Court Documents

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Disqualification

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Defendant Paul Evert's Joinder in Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Case; Comment: Notice of Related Cases

Petition filed

PTC ARB Petition (Picone).pdf; Comment: Petition to Compel Arbitration

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Brian D. Whelan in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Cesar Gustavo Picone in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of Dale Cantrell in Support to Petition to Compel Arbitration

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: Objection to Notice of Related Cases

Order Received for Signature

PTC ARB Prop Order (Picone).pdf; Comment: (Pending Hearing) Order Granting Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Answer Filed

Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Picone).pdf

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -RV Country (No Pos-010)

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Charlie Power (no POS-010 form)

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Paul Everet (no POS-010 form)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMotion - Quash- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Derrick Sachs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPetition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Derrick Sachs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMotion - Quash- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Business subpoenas and protective order - Derrick Sachs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMotion - Amend- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Brian Whelan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Picone, Cesar Gustavo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-52033 Picone, Cesar Gustavo $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Picone, Cesar Gustavo: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Brian D. Whelan in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His Supplemental Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Darrell Starnes in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff;s Motion for Leave to File His Supplemental Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His Supplemental Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Charlie Power (no POS-010 form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Paul Everet (no POS-010 form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Dale Cantrell (no POS-010 form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Picone, Cesar Gustavo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-95452 Picone, Cesar Gustavo $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Picone, Cesar Gustavo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Picone, Cesar Gustavo; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whelan, Brian D