This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/07/2022 at 18:41:21 (UTC).

Cesar Avila Alvarado vs Steven Stadler

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Cesar Avila Alvarado filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Steven Stadler. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Brickey, Gabriel and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0101

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Avila Alvarado, Cesar

an individual

Stadler, Steven Patrick

San Luis Water District

a public entity

City of Mendota

County of Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DeSantis, Daniel

Defendant Attorneys

Davies, Robert E

Walls, Chester E

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

1/12/2022 Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

Civil case cover sheet

1/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

1/10/2022 Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

05/10/2022: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

04/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Jury Deposit

04/26/2022: Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement

04/26/2022: Case Management Statement

CMC Def 5.10.2022.pdf

04/14/2022: CMC Def 5.10.2022.pdf

2/18/2022-Answer

02/18/2022: 2/18/2022-Answer

2-14-22 Answer of San Luis Water District and Steven Stadler's

02/14/2022: 2-14-22 Answer of San Luis Water District and Steven Stadler's

2/1/22 - Proof of Service

02/01/2022: 2/1/22 - Proof of Service

1/25/2022-Proof of Service (County of Fresno)

01/25/2022: 1/25/2022-Proof of Service (County of Fresno)

1/25/2022-Proof of Service (City of Mendota)

01/25/2022: 1/25/2022-Proof of Service (City of Mendota)

1/17/2022-Proof of Service (San Luis)

01/18/2022: 1/17/2022-Proof of Service (San Luis)

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

01/12/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

1/12/2022 Summons

01/12/2022: 1/12/2022 Summons

1/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/10/2022: 1/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Attorney R. Rojas appearing on behalf of Attorney D. DeSantis & Attorney K. Villa appearing on behalf of Attorney R. Davies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: 5/10/22 Defendant City of Mendota Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Alvarado, Cesar: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-25598 Avila Alvarado, Cesar $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Alvarado, Cesar: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for San Luis Water District: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-23039 San Luis Water District $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Alvarado, Cesar: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-02462 Avila Alvarado, Cesar $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila Alvarado, Cesar: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Avila Alvarado, Cesar; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a public entity is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chester E Walls

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E Davies