This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 12:27:13 (UTC).

Cashcall, INC., a California Corporation vs. Peggy Lisle

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Cashcall, INC , a California Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Peggy Lisle. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4913

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cashcall, INC., a California Corporation

Defendant

Lisle, Peggy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moran, Trevor G.

 

Court Documents

7/21/2022 - Complaint

07/21/2022: 7/21/2022 - Complaint

7/21/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/21/2022: 7/21/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2022 - Summons

07/22/2022: 7/22/2022 - Summons

8/5/22 Proof of Service

08/05/2022: 8/5/22 Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cashcall, INC., a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-44915 Cashcall, INC., a California Corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cashcall, INC., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Cashcall, INC., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor G Moran