This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/23/2023 at 01:03:20 (UTC).

Rosa Sandoval Castaneda vs Destiny Segovia

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Rosa Sandoval Castaneda filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Destiny Segovia. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mangano, Robert and Skiles, Jon M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0664

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mangano, Robert

Skiles, Jon M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa

Defendants

Segovia, Destiny Renay

Segovia, Erica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rabi, Justin

Defendant Attorney

Hickey, Trevor W.

 

Court Documents

2-21-23 Complaint

02/21/2023: 2-21-23 Complaint

2-21-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/21/2023: 2-21-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

2-27-23 Summons

02/27/2023: 2-27-23 Summons

2-27-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

02/27/2023: 2-27-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

3-10-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: Erica Segovia

03/10/2023: 3-10-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: Erica Segovia

3-10-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: Destiny Segovia

03/10/2023: 3-10-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: Destiny Segovia

4/7/23 Answer

04/07/2023: 4/7/23 Answer

4/7/23 Defts' Notice of Jury Deposit

04/07/2023: 4/7/23 Defts' Notice of Jury Deposit

4/14/23 Pltf Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial

04/14/2023: 4/14/23 Pltf Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial

Case Management Statement

06/09/2023: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-26107 Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segovia, Erica: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2023-00769 Segovia, Destiny Renay $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segovia, Destiny Renay: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2023-00768 Segovia, Destiny Renay $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: FOR WEB-2023-23854

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segovia, Erica: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-13279 Castaneda, Rosa Sandoval $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Sandoval Castaneda, Rosa; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less