This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/01/2023 at 16:09:17 (UTC).

City Of Fresno vs Maxine Della Garrison as the Successor in Interest to Henry Lewis Garrison, Deceased

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 City Of Fresno filed an Other lawsuit against Maxine Della Garrison as the Successor in Interest to Henry Lewis Garrison, Deceased. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1669

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Petitioners

City Of Fresno

People of the State of California

Respondents

Maxine Della Garrison as the Successor in Interest to Henry Lewis Garrison, Deceased

The Testate and Intestate Successor of Henry Lewis Garrison

All Persons Claiming by, through, or Under such Decedent any Legal or Equitable right, title estate, lien, or interest in real property commonly known as 3893 East Braly Avenue, Fresno, California, Assessor's parcel number 471-192-11

County of Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Luna, Sylvia

 

Court Documents

Application and Order filed

06/15/2023: Application and Order filed

6/13/2023 Declaration of Eva Flores

06/13/2023: 6/13/2023 Declaration of Eva Flores

6/13/2023 Declaration of Homero Montalvo

06/13/2023: 6/13/2023 Declaration of Homero Montalvo

6/13/2023 Declaration of Sylvia Luna

06/13/2023: 6/13/2023 Declaration of Sylvia Luna

6/13/2023 Application and Order to Publish Summons and Petition

06/13/2023: 6/13/2023 Application and Order to Publish Summons and Petition

5-9-23 (Proposed) Order Appointing Receiver - HRG 8/23/23

05/09/2023: 5-9-23 (Proposed) Order Appointing Receiver - HRG 8/23/23

5-9-23 Declaration of Mark Adams In Support Of Petition for Appointment of Receiver - HRG 8/23/23

05/09/2023: 5-9-23 Declaration of Mark Adams In Support Of Petition for Appointment of Receiver - HRG 8/23/23

5-9-23 Declaration of Evangelina Flores In Support Of Petition for Order to Abate - HRG 8/23/23

05/09/2023: 5-9-23 Declaration of Evangelina Flores In Support Of Petition for Order to Abate - HRG 8/23/23

5-9-23 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Petition for Order to Abate - HRG 8/23/23

05/09/2023: 5-9-23 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Petition for Order to Abate - HRG 8/23/23

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/23/2023

DocketGeneral Motion; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Abate ~ Sylvia Luna

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse filed; Comment: County of Fresno's Non-Opposition to City of Fresno's Petition for Order to Abate Substandard Building

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Publication - Maxine Della Garrison

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service - Petition Docs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketApplication and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Application and Order for: Publication of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Homero Montalvo in Support of Order for Publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Eva Flores in Support of Order for Publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Sylvia Luna in Support of Publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: PENDING HEARING (Proposed) Order Appointing Receiver

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Disclaimer of Interest by BMO Harris Bank, N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Mark Adams In Support Of Petition for Appointment of Receiver

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Evangelina Flores In Support Of Petition for Order to Abate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Petition for Order to Abate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Hearing on City of Fresno's Petition for Order to Abate Substandard Building, Appointment of Receiver, and Orders Pursuant to California Health and Safety Code; Declaration of Evangelina Flores in Support Thereof

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPetition filed; Comment: Petition for Order to Abate Substandard Building

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case cover sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less