This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2023 at 16:15:37 (UTC).

Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation vs. Michael Wilson

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 Performance Food Group, Inc , a corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Wilson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4182

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation

Defendants

Wilson, Michael Alan

Wilson, Mike

Coast 2 Coast Pizza and Pasta LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sherman, Marlee E

 

Court Documents

05/16/23 Complaint

05/16/2023: 05/16/23 Complaint

05/16/23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/16/2023: 05/16/23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/19/23 Summons

05/19/2023: 05/19/23 Summons

6/27/2023 Proof of Service

06/27/2023: 6/27/2023 Proof of Service

6/27/2023 Proof of Service

06/27/2023: 6/27/2023 Proof of Service

07/25/2023 - Request for Default

07/25/2023: 07/25/2023 - Request for Default

07/25/2023 - Judgment

07/25/2023: 07/25/2023 - Judgment

07/25/2023 - Declaration CCP 585

07/25/2023: 07/25/2023 - Declaration CCP 585

07/25/2023 - CCP 1033

07/25/2023: 07/25/2023 - CCP 1033

07/25/2023 - REQ FOR DISMISSAL

07/25/2023: 07/25/2023 - REQ FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration - 1033 Attorneys fees, costs and interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration - CCP 585(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Forward to Civil Examiner on 07/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-33991 Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less